Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Kulli

Bishop of Sapë, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1973 Born
14 Sep 199926.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sapë, Albania
29 Jun 200027.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sapë, Albania
15 Jun 201744.3AppointedBishop of Sapë, Albania
14 Sep 201744.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sapë, Albania

MicroData Summary for Simon Kulli
Bishop Simon Kulli (born ) Bishop of Sapë

EventPlace
Birth PlacePistull, Diocese of Sapë
Ordained DeaconCathedral, Shkodrë, Archdiocese of Shkodrë
Ordained PriestCathedral, Shkodrë, Archdiocese of Shkodrë
Ordained BishopNënë Tereza, Cathedral, Vau-Dejës

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sapë.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2017
  • od/c01: CB, 15 Jun 2017
  • ob: CB, 10 Jul 2017
  • c2+: CB, 21 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 14 Sep 2017