Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaroslav Gabro

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1919BornChicago
27 Sep 194526.1Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania
14 Jul 196141.9AppointedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
26 Oct 196142.2Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
28 Mar 198060.6DiedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Jaroslav Gabro:
Bishop Jaroslav Gabro (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 29 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 1 Jun 2015