Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Platon Volodyslav Kornyljak

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Castra Martis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1920BornStebni
25 Mar 194524.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 195938.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)
17 Apr 195938.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Martis
7 Jul 195938.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Martis
16 Dec 199676.3RetiredApostolic Exarch of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)
1 Nov 200080.2DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Platon Volodyslav Kornyljak:
Bishop Platon Volodyslav Kornyljak (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia}

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 66
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014