Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Daniel Ivancho

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

Titular See: (Renounced the Priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1908BornJasina
30 Sep 193426.5Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
30 Jul 194638.3AppointedCoadjutor Apostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
30 Jul 194638.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Europus
5 Nov 194638.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Europus
13 May 194840.1SucceededApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
2 Dec 195446.6ResignedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
1957²48.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Europus
2 Aug 197264.3DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniel Ivancho:
(Layman) Daniel Ivancho (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of United States of America

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 96
  • opd/c1: CB, 20 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 22 Jun 2015