Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Pavel Peter Gojdic, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1888Born
27 Aug 191123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
27 Jan 192334.5IncardinatedPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
14 Sep 192638.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
7 Mar 192738.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Harpasa
25 Mar 192738.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Harpasa
17 Jul 194052.0AppointedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
8 Aug 194052.0InstalledBishop of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
17 Jul 196072.0DiedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes) (Slovakian), Slovakia
4 Nov 2001Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Pavel Peter Gojdic
Bishop Bl. Pavel Peter Gojdic O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev, Eperjes)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRuske Pekljany

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1927, Number 9
  • c1: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 31 Aug 2020

Quantcast