Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Stock

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1918BornSt. Clair, PA
4 Dec 194325.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 197152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
11 Jan 197152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
25 May 197152.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
29 Jun 197253.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Stock:
Bishop John Stock (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015