Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mele

Deceased

Bishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1885BornAcquaformosa
7 Jun 190822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
10 Mar 191933.4AppointedBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
8 Jun 191933.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy
10 Feb 197993.3DiedBishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mele:
Bishop Giovanni Mele (born , died ) Bishop of Lungro degli Italo-Albanesi

  • a priest for 70.7 years
  • a bishop for 59.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1919, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 29 Sep 2013