Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Marcel Henri Louis

Bishop Emeritus of Châlons, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1940 Born
11 Jul 196525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sées {Séez}, France
1 Mar 199958.7AppointedBishop of Châlons, France
11 Apr 199958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Châlons, France
23 Dec 201575.5RetiredBishop of Châlons, France

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Marcel Henri Louis (VIAF: 12540813)
Bishop Gilbert Marcel Henri Louis (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Châlons

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChampsecret, Diocese of Sées {Séez}
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Church, Lonlay-l'Abbaye, Diocese of Sées {Séez}
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Châlons, Diocese of Châlons

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Châlons.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,498
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • mn: CB, 26 Jan 2016
  • c1/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast