Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Marie Joseph Pascal Louis Blondel

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1940 Born
31 Oct 196424.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Limoges, France
27 Jun 196525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Limoges, France
15 Nov 199959.6AppointedBishop of Viviers, France
9 Jan 200059.7Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
22 May 201575.1RetiredBishop of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for François Marie Joseph Pascal Louis Blondel (VIAF: 317292540)
Bishop François Marie Joseph Pascal Louis Blondel (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimoges, Diocese of Limoges
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopParc de l'Ancien Évêché, Viviers, Diocese of Viviers

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viviers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,680
  • r: Bollettino, 22 May 2015
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jul 2018

Quantcast