Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Barberini (Sr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1597BornFlorence, Italy
1623²25.2AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
2 Oct 162326.0Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 162326.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Onofrio
13 Nov 162427.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
1629²31.2AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
24 Nov 163235.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Lorenzo in Damaso
14 Nov 164447.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
23 Oct 164548.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
5 Nov 164548.1Ordained BishopBishop of Sabina, Italy
23 Sep 165255.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
11 Oct 166669.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
166769.2ResignedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
10 Dec 167982.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Barberini (Sr.):
Francesco Cardinal Barberini (Sr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
  • a cardinal for 56.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Oct 1623
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 18
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 672
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 1 Apr 2015