Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Sade

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹Born
5 Sep 166533.6SelectedBishop of Cavaillon, France
1 Mar 166634.1ConfirmedBishop of Cavaillon, France
14 Mar 166634.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
17 Jul 166634.5InstalledBishop of Cavaillon, France
19 Dec 170775.9DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Sade
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Sade (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMazan

  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 May 2018

Quantcast