Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Suburbicarian See of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto

Sabinensis-Mandelensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ernesto Mandara, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Suburbicarian See
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Diocese of Roma {Rome}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 918 (354 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Lazio
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisabinapoggiomirteto.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Piazza Mario Dottori 14, 02047 Poggio Mirteto [Rieti], Italia
  • Telephone: 0765.24.755; 0765.24.019
  • Fax: 0765.44.10.19

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Forum Novum
5th CenturyErectedDiocese of Forum Novum (erected)
Diocese of Vescovio
12th CenturyName ChangedDiocese of Forum Novum Diocese of Vescovio
Diocese of Sabina
21 June 1521Name ChangedDiocese of Vescovio Diocese of Sabina
25 November 1841Territory LostDiocese of Rieti
Diocese of Sabina
Territorial Abbey of San Salvatore Maggiore (suppressed)
Diocese of Poggio Mirteto (erected)
Diocese of Sabina (-Farfa)
25 November 1841UnitedTerritorial Abbey of Farfa
Diocese of Sabina
Diocese of Sabina (-Farfa)
Suburbicarian See of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
3 June 1925UnitedDiocese of Poggio Mirteto
Diocese of Sabina (-Farfa)
Suburbicarian See of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
Suburbicarian See of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
30 September 1986Name ChangedSuburbicarian See of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto Suburbicarian See of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sabina (-Farfa)
188629,456.0%66032OTC
Suburbicarian See of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
195085,50286,64798.7%79311107776122971ap1951
1970106,649106,98599.7%133291626583432177ap1971
1980116,724117,58699.3%972512295613724078ap1981
Suburbicarian See of Sabina-Poggio Mirteto
1990132,884134,48698.8%90361261,0544019082ap1991
1999144,192146,28198.6%103331361,06023820282ap2000
2000144,192146,28198.6%6033931,55013720282ap2001
2001161,052164,05298.2%82331151,40064619282ap2002
2003161,052164,05298.2%80211011,59462716482ap2004
2004162,385165,38598.2%78361141,42465116182ap2005
2010175,808187,35193.8%77321091,61264518982ap2011
2014182,478196,95492.7%77291061,72173315382ap2015

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.7, 31 Aug 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016