Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Pallavicini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1613Born
12 Jan 166046.0AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
25 Jan 166046.1Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
29 Apr 166046.3InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
25 May 167561.4DiedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Pallavicini
Bishop Alessandro Pallavicini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabiano

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 742
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast