Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Flaminio Marcellino

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1611¹BornRoma
21 Apr 165544.3AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
17 May 165544.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
14 Mar 1677³66.2DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Flaminio Marcellino:
Bishop Flaminio Marcellino (died ) Bishop of Cesena

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015