Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Tontoli

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Feb 1667AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
13 Feb 1667Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
16 Feb 1695AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
21 Oct 1696DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Andrea Tontoli
Bishop Andrea Tontoli (died ) Bishop of Vieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManfredonia

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 77
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast