Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso d’Aquino, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹Born
30 Jun 167035.4AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Jul 167035.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
26 Sep 170570.7DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso d’Aquino
Bishop Tommaso d’Aquino C.R. (born 1635, died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomma

  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 365
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast