Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard de Sade

Deceased

Bishop of Cavaillon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornMasano
16 Feb 166060.1AppointedBishop of Cavaillon, France
7 Mar 166060.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cavaillon, France
27 Jun 166363.4DiedBishop of Cavaillon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard de Sade:
Bishop Richard de Sade (died ) Bishop of Cavaillon

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 143
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015