Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marzio Cardinal Ginetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1586Born
19 Jan 162639.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Aug 162741.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Oct 162741.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
6 Feb 163447.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
14 Mar 164458.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
17 Oct 164458.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
19 Feb 164660.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
23 Sep 165266.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
9 Jun 165367.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
6 Jul 165367.4Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Jul 166377.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
11 Oct 166680.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1 Mar 167185.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Marzio Ginetti (VIAF: 33077313)
Marzio Cardinal Ginetti (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVelletri, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
  • a cardinal for 45.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: AT, 15 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,143

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast