Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Fantuzzi (Elefantucci)

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornRavenna
7 Dec 165336.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Aug 167760.6AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
12 Sep 167760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
29 Nov 167962.9DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Fantuzzi (Elefantucci):
Bishop Giacomo Fantuzzi (Elefantucci) (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Cesena

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015