Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Jerónimo Martínez y Rubio

Deceased

Archbishop of Palermo


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Sep 1656SelectedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
15 Jan 1657ConfirmedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
2 Apr 1657Ordained BishopArchbishop of Palermo, Italy
22 Nov 1667DiedArchbishop of Palermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Jerónimo Martínez y Rubio:
Archbishop Pietro Jerónimo Martínez y Rubio (died ) Archbishop of Palermo

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 119, Number 728
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 272
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 188, Number 1,176
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 3 Apr 2015