Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Joseph de Suarès

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1618Born
7 Feb 166748.6AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
13 Feb 166748.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
7 Nov 167052.3DiedBishop of Vaison, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Joseph de Suarès
Bishop Charles-Joseph de Suarès (born , died ) Bishop of Vaison

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAvignon, Archdiocese of Avignon

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,667, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast