Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Strambin, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1621Born
26 Jun 166240.5AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
16 Jul 166240.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
29 Jun 168462.5DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Strambin
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Strambin O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrambino

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast