Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Crisolini

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1626Born
27 Feb 167851.7Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 167851.8AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
12 Jun 167852.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
1682¹55.6DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Crisolini
Bishop Francesco Crisolini (born , died 1682) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Sofia de Ravenna

  • a priest for 3.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast