Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulisse Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1615BornAmeria
12 Jan 165438.7AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
25 Jan 165438.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
Nov 1679³64.5DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ulisse Orsini:
Bishop Ulisse Orsini (born ) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a bishop for 25.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015