Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottaviano della Rovere, B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615BornAsten
17 Jun 167560.5AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
23 Jun 167560.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
Oct 167762.8DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano della Rovere:
Bishop Ottaviano della Rovere B. Bishop of Fossano

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013