Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Antônio Figueiredo, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1939 Born
16 Dec 196728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
21 Jan 198444.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Jan 198444.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ulcinium
10 Mar 198444.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ulcinium
12 Nov 198444.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
3 Aug 198545.6SucceededBishop of Teófilo Otoni, Minas Gerais, Brazil
15 Mar 198949.2AppointedBishop of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Dec 201576.0RetiredBishop of Santo Amaro, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Antônio Figueiredo
Bishop Fernando Antônio Figueiredo O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santo Amaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMuzambinho

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo Amaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast