Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Irineu Danelón, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1940 Born
31 Jan 196423.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Sep 196727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Nov 198747.6AppointedBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 Jan 198847.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil
30 Sep 201575.4RetiredBishop of Lins, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Irineu Danelón
Bishop Irineu Danelón S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lins

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiracicaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lins.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,913
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast