Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vieira de Lima, T.O.R.

Bishop Emeritus of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1931 BornPoconé
7 Dec 195827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
18 Apr 199058.9AppointedBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
29 Jun 199059.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marabá, Para, Brazil
11 Nov 199867.4AppointedBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil
23 Jul 200877.1RetiredBishop of São Luíz de Cáceres, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Vieira de Lima:
Bishop José Vieira de Lima T.O.R. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luíz de Cáceres

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Luíz de Cáceres.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013