Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carlos Castanho de Almeida

Bishop Emeritus of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1930 Born
8 Dec 195323.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Mar 198251.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Mar 198251.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Urusi
2 May 198251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urusi
5 Sep 198757.2AppointedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
23 Mar 199463.7AppointedBishop of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Sep 200373.2ResignedBishop of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos Castanho de Almeida
Bishop José Carlos Castanho de Almeida (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Araçatuba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuarei

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Araçatuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast