Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward Cuthbert Hedley, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Newport, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1837Born
10 Nov 185518.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Oct 186225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 Jul 187336.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newport and Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
22 Jul 187336.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
29 Sep 187336.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
18 Feb 188143.8AppointedBishop of Newport and Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
11 Nov 191578.5DiedBishop of Newport, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Edward Cuthbert Hedley (VIAF: 74658025)
Bishop John Edward Cuthbert Hedley O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Newport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorpeth, Northumberland, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England
Ordained BishopSaint Michael the Archangel Abbey, Belmont

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 167, and Page 408
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 116
  • mn/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017