Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Herbert Alfred Henry Cardinal Vaughan

Deceased

Archbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1832Born
28 Oct 185422.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Sep 187240.4AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 187240.5Ordained BishopBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
8 Apr 189259.9AppointedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
16 Jan 189360.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189360.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
19 Jun 190371.1DiedArchbishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Herbert Alfred Henry Vaughan (VIAF: 73845099)
Herbert Alfred Henry Cardinal Vaughan (born , died ) Archbishop of Westminster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGloucester, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Ordained PriestLucca, Archdiocese of Lucca, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint John, Cathedral, Salford, Diocese of Salford, England
Death PlaceSt. Joseph's College, Mill Hill, Middlesex
Buried Place (Original)St. Joseph's Seminary, Chapel, Mill Hill
Buried Place (Current)St. Thomas of Canterbury Chapel, Cathedral, Westminster, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 492, and Page 598
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 46
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 200, and Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017