Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Gregory Thompson, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gibraltar

Titular Bishop of Thermopylae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1871BornMold, Great Britain
19 Oct 190231.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Nov 191039.6AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
21 Dec 191039.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
25 May 192756.2ResignedBishop of Gibraltar
15 Jul 192756.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermopylae
27 Oct 194271.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for Henry Gregory Thompson:
Bishop Henry Gregory Thompson O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013