Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Briggs

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Beverley, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1788BornBarton on Irwell
19 Jul 181426.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jan 183344.7AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
22 Jan 183344.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
29 Jun 183345.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
28 Jan 183647.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
3 Jul 184052.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yorkshire District, England, Great Britain
29 Sep 185062.4AppointedBishop of Beverley, England, Great Britain
17 Dec 186072.6ResignedBishop of Beverley, England, Great Britain
4 Jan 186172.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Beverley, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Briggs:
Bishop John Briggs (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Beverley

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 149
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 179
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014