Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Henry King

Deceased

Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1880Born
20 Nov 190424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
28 May 193857.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
28 May 193857.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Opus
15 Jul 193857.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Opus
4 Jun 194160.7AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
6 Jun 195473.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
23 Mar 196584.5DiedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Henry King
Archbishop John Henry King (born , died ) Bishop of Portsmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWestfield Farm, Wardour, Salisbury, Wiltshire, Diocese of Clifton, England
Ordained PriestSts. Mary and Peter, Church, St Helier, Jersey, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Death PlaceBishop's House (St. Peter's), Church, Winchester, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Winchester, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 52
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 135
  • c4: CB, 12 Nov 2014
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast