Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henricus Petrus (Hein) Mondé, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of African Missions


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1909Born
27 Jul 193021.4EnteredMember of Society of African Missions
23 Dec 193324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
1958²48.9AppointedSuperior General of Society of African Missions
1973²63.9CeasedSuperior General of Society of African Missions
26 Dec 198576.9DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of African Missions

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henricus Petrus (Hein) Mondé
Father Henricus Petrus (Hein) Mondé S.M.A. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of African Missions

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScheveningen, Diocese of Haarlem, Netherlands
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.0 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast