Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis McNulty

Deceased

Bishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1879Born
16 Apr 191131.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
13 May 193252.7AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
11 Jun 193252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
8 Jun 194363.8DiedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Francis McNulty
Bishop John Francis McNulty (born , died ) Bishop of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCollyhurst, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Salford, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained BishopSt. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England
Death PlaceSt. Andrew, Hospital, Dollis Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 36
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 144
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast