Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Timothy Cotter

Deceased

Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1866Born
19 Jun 189225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne, Ireland
14 Feb 190538.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
14 Feb 190538.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
19 Mar 190538.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Clazomenae
24 Nov 191043.9AppointedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain
24 Oct 194073.8DiedBishop of Portsmouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Timothy Cotter (VIAF: 315944808)
Bishop William Timothy Cotter (born , died ) Bishop of Portsmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCloyne, County Cork, Diocese of Cloyne, Ireland
Ordained PriestSt. Patrick, Seminary, Maynooth, County Kildare, Archdiocese of Dublin, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. John the Evangelist, Cathedral, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Edinburgh Road, Portsmouth, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England
Buried Place (Original)Our Lady of Charity, Convent, Cemetery, Waterlooville, Hampshire, Diocese of Portsmouth, England

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 17
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 72
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast