Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Farmer Healy

Deceased

Bishop of Gibraltar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1900Born
11 Jun 192726.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 195655.6AppointedBishop of Gibraltar
11 Oct 195655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gibraltar
17 Feb 197372.2DiedBishop of Gibraltar

MicroData Summary for John Farmer Healy
Bishop John Farmer Healy (born , died ) Bishop of Gibraltar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKingston, Jamaica, Antilles
Ordained PriestSt. John's, Diocesan Seminary, Wonersh
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Church, Wimbledon, Diocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary the Crowned, Cathedral, Gibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 88
  • c1: CL, 15 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,220

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast