Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Altieri (Sr.)

Deceased

Bishop of Todi

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1589BornRome
1 Dec 161324.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 162434.7AppointedBishop of Camerino, Italy
12 Mar 162434.7Ordained BishopBishop of Camerino, Italy
1627²37.5ResignedBishop of Camerino, Italy
13 Jul 164354.1Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164354.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
31 Aug 164354.2AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
26 Nov 165465.4DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Altieri (Sr.):
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Altieri (Sr.) (born , died ) Bishop of Todi

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 26, and Page 131
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 84, Number 498

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013