Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Sperelli, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹Born
28 Apr 164252.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
28 Apr 164252.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
4 May 164252.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orthosias in Caria
14 Mar 164454.2AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
23 Oct 165262.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
15 Nov 165363.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
19 Dec 167181.9DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Sperelli (VIAF: 15708531)
Bishop Alessandro Sperelli C.O. (born 1590, died ) Bishop of Gubbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAssisi

  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 265, and Page 184
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 107, Number 648
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 19
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast