Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustinus Basrci (Bagesius), O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585¹BornAlbanen
1610²25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Aug 163045.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
12 Aug 163045.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
1 Sep 163045.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
163348.0AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
16 Apr 165267.2DiedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustinus Basrci (Bagesius):
Archbishop Augustinus Basrci (Bagesius) O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 253
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1630, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 6 Mar 2015