Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Riginaldo Lucarini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Feb 1643AppointedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
15 Feb 1643Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy
8 Oct 1671DiedBishop of CittÓ della Pieve, Italy

MicroData Summary for Riginaldo Lucarini:
Bishop Riginaldo Lucarini O.P. (died ) Bishop of CittÓ della Pieve

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1643, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015