Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrizio Donati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Minori


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
28 Feb 163951.1AppointedBishop of Minori, Italy
13 Mar 163951.1Ordained BishopBishop of Minori, Italy
Aug 1648²60.5ResignedBishop of Minori, Italy
31 Aug 166678.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Minori, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrizio Donati:
Bishop Patrizio Donati (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Minori

  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 244
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 621
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015