Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaudenzio Poli

Deceased

Bishop of Amelia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹BornCastello Scheggino
Jan 1643³34.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Feb 164334.1AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
8 Mar 164334.1Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
28 May 167970.4DiedBishop of Amelia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaudenzio Poli:
Bishop Gaudenzio Poli (died ) Bishop of Amelia

  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 81
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 7 Apr 2015