Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso D’Avalos, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1610³Born
24 Mar 164232.0AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
30 Mar 164232.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
4 Dec 164232.7DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso D’Avalos
Bishop Tommaso D’Avalos O.P. (born Mar 1610, died ) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlacePescara

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 646
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast