Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Sersale

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1638AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
21 Dec 1638Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
14 Jul 1665³DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Sersale:
Archbishop Diego Sersale (died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 620
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015