Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Bellino

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Mar 1636AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
30 Mar 1636Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
14 Jan 1641DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Bellino:
Bishop Pietro Bellino (died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 302
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 97, Number 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015