Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio del Pezzo

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jun 1638AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
20 Jun 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
27 Nov 1641AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
12 Mar 1659DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio del Pezzo:
Archbishop Antonio del Pezzo (died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 284, and Page 324
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 101, Number 611
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015