Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Cassiani

Deceased

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1606BornTerra Mont Royal de Rieti
16 Dec 164135.7AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
26 Jan 164235.8Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
1657²50.7DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Cassiani:
Bishop Ascanio Cassiani (born ) Bishop of Andria

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1642, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015