Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enea di Cesare Spennazzi

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1638AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
21 Dec 1638Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
23 May 1644AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
1658¹DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enea di Cesare Spennazzi:
Bishop Enea di Cesare Spennazzi (died 1658) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 323, and Page 186
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 103, Number 620
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015